U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 13, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Waiver - MT]
  • January 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.