U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Champine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • January 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.