U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Fink v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.