U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Schauers
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 17, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 26, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • April 15, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • April 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 13, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.