U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00003
  • Case Name: Billings Yellow Cab, LLC v. National Indemnity Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • February 10, 2022: [Remand]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 14, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.