U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Skaggs et al v. Boone et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Objection - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Pro Se Motion for Extension - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • August 30, 2022: [Pro Se Answer]
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 14, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2022: [Entry of Default]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Pro Se Notice - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Pro Se Registration Form]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 15, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • January 15, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.