U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Mount v. United States of America, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 20, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.