U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Salmonsen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set Aside Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.