U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Emhoff v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 19, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.