U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Devereaux v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Administrative Record]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 19, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.