U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Rosenquist et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - SDM]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order/Judgment - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • February 24, 2022: [Entry of Default]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 19, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.