U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Bugni et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • September 14, 2022: [Vacate]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • June 24, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 15, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.