U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coffin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 19, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.