U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lequin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.