U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cervantes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 13, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.