U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kroepelin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 12, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.