U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dempster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • May 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.