U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hickel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.