U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Glacier Bear Retreat, LLC et al v. Dusek et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [In Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 18, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 28, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Remark]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • March 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appear]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 25, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • February 24, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 08, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 26, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • January 24, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.