U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sebastian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 22, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.