U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCleery et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • August 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.