U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Lowe v. Geissel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 14, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • March 31, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 21, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.