U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Todd
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 03, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 08, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.