U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galloway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 27, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.