U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Moonrise Partners, LLC v. Town of West Yellowstone, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • April 16, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 08, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Appear]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.