U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Kerns v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • July 26, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order]
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 27, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.