U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elverud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 29, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 03, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 25, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.