U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 24, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 04, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.