U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zinda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 11, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 11, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.