U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Angel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [821 Remark-MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment (782/821)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 17, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • April 05, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.