U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamilton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • September 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 01, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 20, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 20, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.