U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Stalnaker et al v. 5Fold Collective et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Order - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • December 07, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • November 09, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appear]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
  • May 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 27, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.