U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appear]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.