U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kullberg et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Satisfaction of Judgment - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • September 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 28, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.