U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pearson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Exparte Motion - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 28, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.