U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shorter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • January 24, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • September 09, 2022: [Quash ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Summons]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • January 28, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.