U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Mellin v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief - MT]
  • July 05, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • April 04, 2022: [Administrative Record]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 31, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 31, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.