U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaure
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.