U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00008
  • Case Name: Warner v. Godfrey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 25, 2023: [Disqualify Judge]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order/Judgment - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.