U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Woods v. Meadowlark Home Care
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 23, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • May 20, 2022: [Expedite]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
  • May 13, 2022: [Disqualify Judge]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Consent to Electronic Service]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.