U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lonebear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.