U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:16-cr-00017-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer/Supervised Release - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Remark - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • July 25, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • March 10, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 09, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.