U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Owl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • March 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.