U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiseman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 02, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 19, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.