U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sayetsitty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 01, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 01, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • August 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • July 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.