U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boucher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 20, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 23, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.