U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Howard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.