U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Korst v. Jefferson County, Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • May 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 01, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • April 01, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 09, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 03, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • February 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.