U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zamora-Cuevas, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 15, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 28, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Remark - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.