U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sponholtz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 26, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • May 23, 2022: [Stipulation - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 07, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • February 03, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.